This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2019 at 03:37:16 (UTC).

TWO LUCKY STAR INC VS SUPER HK EL MONTE INC.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 TWO LUCKY STAR INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUPER HK EL MONTE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0727

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWO LUCKY STAR INC

Defendant

SUPER HK EL MONTE INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/6/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • Hearing02/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 1A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/07/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/04/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant) to Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant) to Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant) to Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant) to Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant