This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2019 at 00:54:15 (UTC).

TWO LUCKY STAR INC. VS SUPER HK EL MONTE INC.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 TWO LUCKY STAR INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUPER HK EL MONTE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8537

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWO LUCKY STAR INC. DBA SKY PRODUCE

Defendant

SUPER HK EL MONTE INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/31/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/15/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/23/2019

9/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/23/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Two Lucky Star Inc. on 07/31/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/23/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 09/23/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/08/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Two Lucky Star Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Super HK El Monte Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant