This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 01:04:43 (UTC).

TWO JINN INC VS WHITE, KATHERINE

Case Summary

On 08/18/2015 TWO JINN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITE, KATHERINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5826

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWO JINN INC DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS

Defendant

WHITE KATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/18/2015: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

8/18/2015: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/18/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($39.00)

10/29/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($39.00)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/4/2015: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order

11/4/2015: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/5/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/25/2016: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

6/13/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

9/13/2016: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

9/20/2016: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Claim of Exemption

9/20/2016: Claim of Exemption

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

10/13/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/13/2016

10/13/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/13/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

11/14/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Order Determining Claim Of Exemption

11/14/2016: Order Determining Claim Of Exemption

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/14/2016

11/14/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/14/2016

Writ - Return

9/6/2018: Writ - Return

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 388.17; Interest Credits: 451.31; Principal Credits: 10.52; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Hearing for Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim: Result Date changed from 10/13/2016 to 11/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/14/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 11/14/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 11/14/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketOrder Determining Claim Of Exemption; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Determining Claim Of Exemption: Result: Granted in Part; Filed By Parties changed to (TWO JINN INC) (Plaintiff) ; Result Date: 11/14/2016; As To Parties changed to KATHERINE WHITE (Defendant) ; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Hearing for Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim: Result: Result Date: 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TWO JINN INC) (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 124.17; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (WHITE, KATHERINE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (TWO JINN INC) DBA (ALADDIN BAIL BONDS) . MONIQUE CARBAJAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:37A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (WHITE, KATHERINE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/15 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899037. HEARING SET FOR 11/04/15 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (TWO JINN INC) DBA (ALADDIN BAIL BONDS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketFICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less