Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 16:18:06 (UTC).

TWO JINN INC VS LAURA CORONA

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 TWO JINN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAURA CORONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2670

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWO JINN INC DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS

1000 Aviara Pkwy #300

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Defendant

CORONA LAURA

City Of Industry, CA 91748

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

(Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

(Los Angeles)

5/22/2018: (Los Angeles)

by Luz Olmos

12/20/2017: by Luz Olmos

Unknown

1/19/2018: Unknown

(w/ Fictitious Business Name)

12/20/2017: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Two Jinn Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 02/13/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Two Jinn Inc DBA Aladdin Bail Bonds against Defendant Laura Corona on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Two Jinn Inc on 12/20/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $103.00 for a total of $2,603.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Two Jinn Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Laura Corona (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 1/14/2018; Service Cost: 53.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Two Jinn Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Laura Corona (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Luz Olmos; Filed by: Two Jinn Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less