This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 00:26:00 (UTC).

TWIN MED, LLC VS VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 TWIN MED, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9484

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWIN MED LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/10/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/10/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TWIN MED, LLC on 11/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by TWIN MED, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TWIN MED, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC; On the Complaint filed by TWIN MED, LLC on 11/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TWIN MED, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/11/2020; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TWIN MED, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/11/2020; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TWIN MED, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC (Defendant); Does 1 to 20 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TWIN MED, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC (Defendant); Does 1 to 20 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TWIN MED, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC (Defendant); Does 1 to 20 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWIN MED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.