Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2017 at 10:10:30 (UTC).

TWH ANNUITIES AND INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. VS CLAUDE B ATAM

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 TWH ANNUITIES AND INSURANCE AGENCY, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLAUDE B ATAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0869

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWH ANNUITIES AND INSURANCE AGENCY INC.

6200 E. Canyon Rim Road Suite 203

Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

Defendant

ATAM CLAUDE B

Burbank, CA 92320

 

Court Documents

Minute Order of 04/05/2017

4/5/2017: Minute Order of 04/05/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection

3/23/2017: Notice of Rejection

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/30/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/30/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/30/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Greg B. Skogsberg

6/6/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Greg B. Skogsberg

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

6/6/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 06/06/2017

6/6/2017: Minute Order of 06/06/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/06/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Greg B. Skogsberg; Filed by: TWH Annuities and Insurance Agency, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 RES to 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: TWH Annuities and Insurance Agency, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Claude B Atam (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170130E5457 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170130E5457 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: TWH Annuities and Insurance Agency, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Claude B Atam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less