This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 at 12:46:37 (UTC).

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC VS FLORES, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORES, CARLOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1234

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC

25202 Crenshaw Blvd, Suite 300

Torrance, CA 90505

Defendant

FLORES CARLOS

Apple Valley, CA 92308

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/23/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/23/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/23/2016: Minute Order of 06/23/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/23/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/23/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/23/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC) against Defendant (FLORES, CARLOS) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC on 02/18/2016 (from ING16S01234) for the principal amount of $3,201.89 and costs of $135.00 for a total of $3,336.89.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/23/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART, PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/23/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM. RETURNED AS TO (FLORES, CARLOS) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER. FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (FLORES, CARLOS) BY SUB-SERVING LUIS DOE - TENANT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/27/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 COSTS OF $ 85.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING270104007. HEARING SET FOR 04/27/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC is a litigant