This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 08:41:24 (UTC).

TUYET HANG TRAN VS JORGE MARADIAGA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 TUYET HANG TRAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE MARADIAGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1220

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN TUYET HANG

Defendants

MARADIAGA JORGE

GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNHAM DONALD TILDON

Defendant Attorney

FIELDS GARY D.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/1/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Filing Proof of Service

2/28/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Filing Proof of Service

Answer - Answer

3/19/2019: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

7/10/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/22/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

5/15/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/11/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Tuyet Hang Tran on 02/01/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Tuyet Hang Tran as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 05/15/2020 to 05/15/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/10/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Maradiaga (Defendant); Service Date: 02/18/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Maradiaga (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Maradiaga (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Maradiaga (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tuyet Hang Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Maradiaga (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT CENTURY SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELDS GARY D.