This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2019 at 01:04:38 (UTC).

TUSIT K BARUA, ET AL. VS ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 TUSIT K BARUA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0727

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARUA TUSIT K

Los Angeles, CA 90004

BARUA MAHUYA

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendants

BOUCHE JEAN JACQUES

JEAN JACQUES BOUCHE TRUST

Po Box 1599

Laguna Beach, CA 92652

ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

4000 Venice Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90019

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/19/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/19/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/19/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/19/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/29/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/29/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/29/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/19/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 03/19/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tusit K Barua, et al. on 01/19/2018, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Jean Jacques Bouche

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Tusit K Barua and Plaintiff Mahuya Barua against Defendant Jean Jacques Bouche trust and Defendant Alliance Property Management, Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tusit K Barua, et al. on 01/19/2018 for the principal amount of $1,400.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $1,450.00, joint and several.; Other: Defendant, Jean Jacques Bouche, is dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Alliance Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Jean JAcques Bouche trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Jean Jacques Bouche trust (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Jean JAcques Bouche trust to Jean Jacques Bouche trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tusit K Barua (Plaintiff); Mahuya Barua (Plaintiff); As to: Jean JAcques Bouche trust (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tusit K Barua (Plaintiff); Mahuya Barua (Plaintiff); As to: Alliance Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tusit K Barua (Plaintiff); Mahuya Barua (Plaintiff); As to: Jean Jacques Bouche (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tusit K Barua (Plaintiff); Mahuya Barua (Plaintiff); As to: Alliance Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Jean Jacques Bouche (Defendant); Jean JAcques Bouche trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant