This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:23 (UTC).

TSENG, DIANA LICHIN VS HORN, KACY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 TSENG, DIANA LICHIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HORN, KACY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0271

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSENG DIANA LICHIN

Defendant

HORN KACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAL, VINCENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • OSC SET 07/28/15, 0830 AM, DEPT. S12, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less