Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2016 at 05:17:28 (UTC).

TRIPOLI STREET PROPERTIES LLC VS. AUSTIN, RONALD

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 TRIPOLI STREET PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AUSTIN, RONALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL BECKLOFF and MARK A. YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4996

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL BECKLOFF

Judge

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIPOLI STREET PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

AUSTIN RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - LINDA T. HOLLENBECK ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WEM , HON. MITCHELL BECKLOFF PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THIS MATTER WAS PREVIOUSLY SET FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE ON JANUARY 10, 2017. THE COURT WILL BE DARK THAT DATE. THEREFORE, THE STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SET ON JANUARY 10, 2017 IS ADVANCED TO THIS DATE AND CONTINUED TO JANUARY 31, 2017 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT M. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING ON 01/30/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6 FILED BY (AUSTIN, RONALD) AS TO HONORABLE MARK A. YOUNG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. MITCHELL BECKLOFF PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: 170.6 AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE FILING . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: A PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER SECTION 170.6 OF THE CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE WAS FILED BY THE DEFENDANT HEREIN AGAINST THE HON. MARK A. YOUNG. THE COURT FINDS IT WAS TIMELY FILED. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING AND PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF THE MASTER CALENDAR FOR THE WEST DISTRICT OF THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, MITCHELL BECKLOFF, SUPERVISING JUDGE PRESIDING, THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M, THE HON. MITCHELL BECKLOFF PRESIDING. THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR FOR A STATUS HEARING ON JANUARY 10, 2017 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. WEM . PURSUANT TO 170.6 FILING AGAINST THE HON. MARK A. YOUNG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR TRIAL RECEIVED AS TO (AUSTIN, RONALD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (AUSTIN, RONALD) IN THE SUM OF $ 150.00 FOR JURY FEES . RECEIPT # SM278865008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (AUSTIN, RONALD) JURY FEES POSTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (AUSTIN, RONALD) . RECEIPT # SM447184022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WES RE: ORDER TO POST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM278865003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 01/10/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WEM . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE MARK A. YOUNG .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - LINDA T. HOLLENBECK ESQ