This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:29:43 (UTC).

TRIANGLE PLAZA LLC VS RAY DIAB

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 TRIANGLE PLAZA LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAY DIAB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0420

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIANGLE PLAZA LLC

Defendant

DIAB RAY DBA ACS WIRELESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EANDI MATTHEW J

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/15/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/27/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Application for Writ of Possession

3/7/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ - Return

7/19/2018: Writ - Return

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/7/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/21/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/21/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

2/8/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/25/2018: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Possession): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Possession); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Updated -- Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Triangle Plaza Llc against Defendant Ray Diab DBA ACS Wireless on the Complaint filed by Triangle Plaza Llc on 01/10/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 623-625 S Central Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90021 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Triangle Plaza Llc (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Triangle Plaza Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Does: All doe defendants only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by Triangle Plaza Llc on 01/10/2018, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does All doe defendants only

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2018
  • Updated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Triangle Plaza Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Ray Diab (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Triangle Plaza Llc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Promotion Company, Inc. d/b/a WHR Motorsports is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J. Eandi