This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2019 at 01:57:19 (UTC).

TRAVON RAY GOSEY VS WORLD UNITY INTERNANTIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 TRAVON RAY GOSEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WORLD UNITY INTERNANTIONAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1358

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOSEY TRAVON RAY

Defendants

WORLD UNITY INTERNANTIONAL

LING PAUL E

WORLD UNITY INTERNATION PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/26/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Anaya Mercedes

6/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Anaya Mercedes

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/9/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

2/9/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

3/22/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Anaya Mercedes: Name Extension: Anaya Mercedes; Exact Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketAnaya Mercedes; Filed by: World Unity Internation Property Management Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 05:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse West at Department 103 updated: Result Date to 06/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Travon Ray Gosey on 03/22/2017: Defendants World Unity International Property Management Inc. Paul E Ling do not owe the plaintiff Travon Ray Gosey any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The Court orders Anaya Mercedes dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Travon Ray Gosey (Plaintiff); As to: Paul E Ling (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/02/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 05:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse West at Department 103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Travon Ray Gosey (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity Internation Property Management Inc. (Defendant); Paul E Ling (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Travon Ray Gosey (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170210E2255 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170210E2255 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Travon Ray Gosey (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity Internantional (Defendant); Paul S Ling (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less