This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 05:26:13 (UTC).

TRAN, KRISTINE VS KURERA, MALKANTHI

Case Summary

On 12/03/2013 TRAN, KRISTINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KURERA, MALKANTHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7038

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN KRISTINE

Defendant

KURERA MALKANTHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES DALE C FRAILEY

JUSTIN K STRASSBURG ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/03/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • OSC SET 12/05/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRASSBURG JUSTIN K.