Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 09:26:53 (UTC).

TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION VS ESPINOZA, MARIA M.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESPINOZA, MARIA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4159

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION

Defendant

ESPINOZA MARIA M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BENJAMIN WOO - WOO, BENJAMIN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BENJAMIN WOO

WOO BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/13/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) - Conditional

1/18/2018: Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) - Conditional

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/19/2018: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment

7/16/2018: Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - for Entry of Judgment

8/9/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - for Entry of Judgment

Order (name extension)

8/15/2018: Order (name extension)

Judgment

8/15/2018: Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/27/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA M. ESPINOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • order for entry of stipulated judgment; Filed by: Attorney; As to: (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Stipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) against Defendant (ESPINOZA, MARIA M.) on the Complaint filed by TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION on 07/19/2017 for the principal amount of $2,944.14, attorney fees of $266.65, interest of $6,935.98, and costs of $350.00 for a total of $10,496.77.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Stipulation and Order for Entry of Judgment; Filed by: (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA M. ESPINOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) Conditional; Filed by: (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA M. ESPINOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA M. ESPINOZA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/14/2017; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: (TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA M. ESPINOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/06/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR498386006. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRACO INVESTMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Woo, Benjamin