This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 03:37:00 (UTC).

TRACIE POWELL VS RAFIE ZAMANI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 TRACIE POWELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAFIE ZAMANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4492

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL TRACIE

Defendants

ZAMANI RAFIE

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY D/B/A METRO DBA METRO

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY AKA METRO A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

DESTINATION ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTIERREZ MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

CHASTANG RICHARD PAUL

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R.

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL

GRAHAM NICHOLAS ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Consolidation; Filed by: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY d/b/a METRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 07/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/26/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase special status: Consolidation Required; Start Date updated from 07/26/2021 to 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase numbers 19STLC04492, and 21STLC00748 consolidated; case number 19STLC04492 is the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DESTINATION ENTERPRISES, INC. (Defendant); As to: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Hearing on Defendants Motion To Consolidate; Filed by: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY d/b/a METRO (Defendant); As to: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 07/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff); As to: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/21/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Notice of Change of Firm Address; Filed by: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff); As to: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY d/b/a METRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff); As to: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY d/b/a METRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff); As to: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY d/b/a METRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tracie Powell (Plaintiff); As to: RAFIE ZAMANI (Defendant); THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY d/b/a METRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 19STLC04492 Hearing Date: July 26, 2021 Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION\r\nFOR CONSOLIDATION

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING PARTY: Defendants\r\nLos Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority and Rafie Zamani

\r\n\r\n

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Tracie Powell

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 1048; CRC 3.350)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendants Los Angeles Metropolitan\r\nTransportation Authority and Rafie Zamani’s Motion for Consolidation is GRANTED.\r\nThis action and Powell v. Destination Enterprises, Inc., et al., Case\r\nNo. 21STLC00748 are HEREBY CONSOLIDATED. This action is designated the lead\r\ncase and trial is set for July 27, 2022.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SERVICE: \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nProof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nCorrect Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\n16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

OPPOSITION: Filed on June 8, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

\r\n\r\n

REPLY: None filed as\r\nof July 21, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

I. \r\nBackground\r\n& Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On May 8, 2019, Plaintiff Tracie\r\nPowell (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action against Rafie Zamani (“Zamani”)\r\nand The Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (“LACMTA”)\r\nalleging intentional interference with prospective economic relationship and\r\nintentional interference with contractual relations causes of action (the\r\n“First Action”). Defendants Zamani and LACMTA filed a joint Answer on June 23,\r\n2020.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff filed another action against\r\nDefendants Destination Enterprises, Inc. (“Destination”) and LACMTA on January\r\n27, 2021 alleging FEHA retaliation and discrimination, Case No. 21STLC00748\r\n(the “Second Action”). Defendant LACMTA filed an Answer on April 15, 2021. The\r\nSecond Action is currently pending in this Department and is set for trial for\r\nJuly 27, 2022.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On May 24, 2021, Defendants LACMTA and\r\nZamani filed the instant Motion for Consolidation (the “Motion”) seeking to\r\nconsolidate the First and Second Actions. Plaintiff filed a partial opposition\r\non June 8, 2021. No reply brief was filed.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

At the June 21, 2021 hearing, the\r\nCourt noted that although it was inclined to grant the Motion, the moving\r\nparties had not satisfied the procedural requirements of California Rules of\r\nCourt, rule 3.350. (6/21/21 Minute Order.) Specifically, the moving parties had\r\nnot filed a copy of the notice of motion under the Second Action as required by\r\nRule 3.350, subdivision (a)(1)(C). (Id.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendants\r\nLACMTA and Zamani filed and served a notice of motion in the Second Action on\r\nJune 21, 2021.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Accordingly,\r\nthe Motion is now GRANTED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

II. \r\nConclusion\r\n& Order

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

For the foregoing reasons, Defendants\r\nLos Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority and Rafie Zamani’s Motion for\r\nConsolidation is GRANTED. This action and Powell v. Destination Enterprises,\r\nInc., et al., Case No. 21STLC00748 are HEREBY CONSOLIDATED. This action is\r\ndesignated the lead case and trial is set for July 27, 2022.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party is ordered to give\r\nnotice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTIERREZ MATTHEW