Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 07:58:45 (UTC).

TOTTEN TUBES, INC. VS SPARLING INSTRUMENTS

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 TOTTEN TUBES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SPARLING INSTRUMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4654

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTTEN TUBES INC.

Defendant

SPARLING INSTRUMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENKINS STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TOTTEN TUBES, INC. on 06/03/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by TOTTEN TUBES, INC. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TOTTEN TUBES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPARLING INSTRUMENTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to SPARLING INSTRUMENTS; On the Complaint filed by TOTTEN TUBES, INC. on 06/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TOTTEN TUBES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPARLING INSTRUMENTS (Defendant); Service Date: 06/08/2020; Service Cost: 63.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TOTTEN TUBES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPARLING INSTRUMENTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TOTTEN TUBES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPARLING INSTRUMENTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TOTTEN TUBES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SPARLING INSTRUMENTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOTTEN TUBES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS STEPHEN