This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2019 at 14:13:51 (UTC).

TORRES, JESUS VS DIAZ, ROCIO

Case Summary

On 06/21/2012 TORRES, JESUS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIAZ, ROCIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA SUMMERHAYES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1023

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DIANA SUMMERHAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES JESUS

Defendant

DIAZ ROCIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - LAURENCE H. LISHNER

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

LISHNER LAURENCE H.

Defendant Attorneys

BASTA INC - SHIPITSYNA, SARAH TRUESDELL

Attorney at BASTA INC

SHIPITSYNA SARAH TRUESDELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2014
  • ** RECORD NOW AVAILABLE PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THE COURT ORDER **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM12Q01023 TO LB 12Q01023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • ** RECORD UNAVAILABLE PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER ** CSE ORDERED SEALED BY THE COURT UNTIL 7/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SASE . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 43.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (DIAZ, ROCIO) FOR REJECTION OF JURY FEE CHECK: STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED 7-17-12. CHECK 4217 IS RETURNED VIA-MAIL TO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. SUBMITTED ON 07/18/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 00N , HON. DIANA SUMMERHAYES, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING ATTY. JUSTIN EISER (X) . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING ATTY. KEVIN HERMANSEN (X) .

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (DIAZ, ROCIO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (DIAZ, ROCIO) . RECEIPT # FW .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 07/17/12 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 00N .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (DIAZ, ROCIO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN COM503382030. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PUBLIC COUNSEL - SHIPITSYNA, SARAH TRUESDELL