This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 08:36:25 (UTC).

TOP TEAM REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT VS CASIQUE, JORGE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2012 TOP TEAM REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASIQUE, JORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0831

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOP TEAM REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Defendants

CASIQUE JORGE

CASIQUE ALEXANDER

ALEXANDER CASIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIERSTADT, EDWARD T

Defendant Attorneys

CASIQUE JR., JORGE

CASIQUE JR. JORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 1,614.86; Interest: 825.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: As to: TOP TEAM REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: TOP TEAM REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT (Plaintiff); As to: JORGE CASIQUE (Defendant); CASIQUE ALEXANDER (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 825.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 12/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY SATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.