This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:11:04 (UTC).

TOP FINANCE COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ANYTIME RENT A CAR, A CALIFORNIA COPRORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 TOP FINANCE COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANYTIME RENT A CAR, A CALIFORNIA COPRORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3957

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOP FINANCE COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

TSYMBALOV IND. AND AS GUARANTOR VITALIY

ANYTIME RENT A CAR A CALIFORNIA COPRORATION DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOW RON

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/15/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Top Finance Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vitaliy Tsymbalov, ind. and as Guarantor (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/05/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Top Finance Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent A Car, a California coproration (Defendant); Service Date: 07/19/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/15/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Top Finance Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent A Car, a California coproration (Defendant); Vitaliy Tsymbalov, ind. and as Guarantor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Top Finance Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent A Car, a California coproration (Defendant); Vitaliy Tsymbalov, ind. and as Guarantor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Top Finance Company, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Anytime Rent A Car, a California coproration (Defendant); Vitaliy Tsymbalov, ind. and as Guarantor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANYTIME RENT A CAR INC. DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Top Finance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW RON