This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 12:52:59 (UTC).

TITAN INDEMNITY COMPANY VS GARCIA, CARLOS BENITES

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 TITAN INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARCIA, CARLOS BENITES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4529

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TITAN INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

GARCIA CARLOS BENITES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

 

Court Documents

(name extension) - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

5/18/2017: (name extension) - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

Complaint - Complaint Auto

4/13/2017: Complaint - Complaint Auto

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

5/9/2017: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons

4/13/2017: Summons - Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/15/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - AUTO Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/13/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less