Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2020 at 07:50:48 (UTC).

TINA PETE VS ATHENA D. PARLAMAN

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 TINA PETE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ATHENA D PARLAMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1490

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETE TINA

Defendant

PALAMAN ATHENA D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/30/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2/24/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/31/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/8/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/12/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

11/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/30/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/19/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Athena D. Palaman (Defendant) to Athena D. Palaman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Athena D. Palaman (Defendant) to Athena D. Palaman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/28/2020 ; Status Date changed from 01/30/2020 to 02/28/2020 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/28/2020 ; Status Date changed from 02/28/2020 to 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/28/2020 ; Status Date changed from 02/28/2020 to 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/28/2020 ; Status Date changed from 02/28/2020 to 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Tina Pete (Plaintiff); As to: Athena D. Palaman (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Tina Pete against Defendant Athena D. Palaman on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tina Pete on 09/19/2019 for the principal amount of $254.93 for a total of $254.93.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tina Pete (Plaintiff); As to: Athena D. Palaman (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Athena D. Palaman (Defendant) to Athena D. Palaman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docket** Case Name changed from TINA PETE vs ATHENA D. PALAMAN to TINA PETE vs ATHENA D. PARLAMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tina Pete (Plaintiff); As to: Athena D. Palaman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Tina Pete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tina Pete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Athena D. Palaman (Defendant) to Athena D. Palaman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 09/19/2019 to 09/19/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less