This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 01:27:26 (UTC).

TIMOTHY LEE WALKER VS ABIR COHEN TREYZON SALO LLP

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 TIMOTHY LEE WALKER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ABIR COHEN TREYZON SALO LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2836

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER TIMOTHY LEE

Manhattan Beac, CA 90266

Defendant

ABIR COHEN TREYZON SALO LLP COMP OF TERRY BAILEY & ALEXANDER COHEN & BORIS TREYZON

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 935

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/16/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/16/2018

10/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/16/2018

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 10/16/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Timothy Lee Walker on 09/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/16/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Timothy Lee Walker (Plaintiff); As to: Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABIR COHEN TREYZON SALO LLP is a litigant