Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 07:48:51 (UTC).

TIFFANY BOYD VS JUAN MANUEL MARQUEZ REBOLLAR

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 TIFFANY BOYD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN MANUEL MARQUEZ REBOLLAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6135

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYD TIFFANY

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Defendants

MARQUEZ REBOLLAR JUAN MANUEL

Long Beach, CA 90806

MARQUEZ REBOLLAR EFREN

Long Beach, CA 90806

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

2/7/2018: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

12/20/2017: Other - - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Other - - Statement of Decision

11/14/2017: Other - - Statement of Decision

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/14/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/14/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/14/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/9/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2017

8/30/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/20/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (VIA FAX)

6/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (VIA FAX)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Other - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Tiffany Boyd against Defendant Efren Marquez Rebollar on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tiffany Boyd on 06/20/2017 for the principal amount of $3,200.00 and costs of $135.00 for a total of $3,335.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tiffany Boyd on 06/20/2017 as follows: Defendant Juan Manuel Marquez Rebollar does not owe the plaintiff Tiffany Boyd any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Other - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 11/09/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Tiffany Boyd (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Manuel Marquez Rebollar (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/07/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Updated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Name Extension changed from [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (VIA FAX)] to [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016090 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: DW-2017-0016090 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (VIA FAX): Name Extension: (VIA FAX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tiffany Boyd (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Manuel Marquez Rebollar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (VIA FAX)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less