This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 06:44:11 (UTC).

TIFFANY BARLOW, ET AL. VS CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 TIFFANY BARLOW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7133

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARLOW TIFFANY

Los Angeles, CA 90037

MILLER IVORY

Los Angeles, CA 90044

Defendants

CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC

320 W. Manchester Ave,

Los Angeles, CA 90003

MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

320 W Manchester Ave, Ste B

Los Angeles, CA 90003

Assignee

VAN NUYS FINANCIAL

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

8/5/2019: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

8/5/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Los Angeles) (Partially Satisfied)

5/7/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Los Angeles) (Partially Satisfied)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/4/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Order on Request for Court Order

1/8/2018: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of 01/16/2018

1/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of 01/16/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)

1/16/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/08/2018

1/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/08/2018

Minute Order - (Court Order)

1/8/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

12/19/2017: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/19/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

10/10/2017: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Request for Court Order and Answer - (BY FAX)

10/3/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer - (BY FAX)

Minute Order - (Court Order)

10/18/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - No Service

8/21/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Subpoena & Proof of Service

8/2/2017: Subpoena & Proof of Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/1/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return (Los Angeles) (Partially Satisfied) ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 1,290.73; Interest Credits: 68.40; Principal Credits: 747.61; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Van Nuys Financial (Assignee); As to: Century One Auto Center Inc (Defendant); Manchester Automotive Group, Inc (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 1,265.73; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: Van Nuys Financial (Assignee); As to: Tiffany Barlow (Plaintiff); Ivory Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Tiffany Barlow (Plaintiff); As to: Manchester Automotive Group, Inc (Defendant); Interest: 457.38; Service Date: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by: Tiffany Barlow (Plaintiff); As to: Century One Auto Center Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ivory Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ivory Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tiffany Barlow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Tiffany Barlow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tiffany Barlow (Plaintiff); Ivory Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Century One Auto Center Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY ONE AUTO CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where VAN NUYS FINANCIAL is a litigant