This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 19:18:43 (UTC).

TIEN WANG VS RADIANT FOOTWEAR, INC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 TIEN WANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RADIANT FOOTWEAR, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0500

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG TIEN

Defendant

RADIANT FOOTWEAR INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/25/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/25/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

6/7/2018: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

7/11/2018: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 07/11/2018

7/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 07/11/2018

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

7/11/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

RETURNED MAIL

8/1/2018: RETURNED MAIL

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

5/25/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/25/2018

5/25/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/25/2018

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/21/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

5/16/2018: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

3/16/2018: Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/2/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

2/2/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/2/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/2/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- RETURNED MAIL: As To Parties: Tien Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Tien Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 07/11/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tien Wang on 02/02/2018, judgment entered on 05/25/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Defendant's Claim filed by Radiant Footwear, Inc on 05/16/2018, judgment entered on 05/25/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 07/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 07/11/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Radiant Footwear, Inc (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tien Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Radiant Footwear, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tien Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Radiant Footwear, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less