Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 14:04:56 (UTC).

TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY VS LAKEISHA BOYD

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAKEISHA BOYD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6908

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BOYD LAKEISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA GRACE

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/5/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/14/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/14/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Hearing07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Tidewater Finance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Lakeisha Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lakeisha Boyd; On the Complaint filed by Tidewater Finance Company on 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tidewater Finance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Lakeisha Boyd (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2020; Service Cost: 84.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tidewater Finance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Lakeisha Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tidewater Finance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Lakeisha Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tidewater Finance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Lakeisha Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY T/A TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICES AND TIDEWATER MOTOR CREDIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA GRACE