Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2018 at 10:24:20 (UTC).

THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY VS R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4156

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GABA LAW CORPORATION - RUDY GABA JR.

Attorney at GABA LAW CORPORATION

GABA JR. RUDY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 8,624.03; Interest: 75.52; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: (R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC) (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 75.52; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY against Defendant (R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC) on the Complaint filed by THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY on 07/19/2017 for the principal amount of $7,218.75, attorney fees of $523.12, interest of $578.16, and costs of $304.00 for a total of $8,624.03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY on 07/19/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Declaration Attorney's Fees; Filed by: (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Declaration Underlying Action For Open Book Account; Filed by: (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: (R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Default entered as to (R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC); On the Complaint filed by THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY on 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (THOMPSON INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: (R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC) (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/18/17; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/06/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR498386030. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & S PRODUCTION SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA JR. RUDY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO