This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2020 at 11:38:32 (UTC).

THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II VS JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5027

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS THOMAS BRYANT II

Defendant

HARRIS JAMISON DIQUON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/17/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

10/9/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/16/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

7/8/2019: Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

7/8/2019: Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

7/8/2019: Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

7/8/2019: Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

6/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 04/30/2019 entered for Plaintiff THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS II against Defendant JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS.

4/30/2019: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 04/30/2019 entered for Plaintiff THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS II against Defendant JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS.

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/28/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

1/28/2019: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/24/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...) of 12/17/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/17/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/17/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRequest Plaintiff's Request to Vacate Hearing on Debtor's Examination & Motion to Compel Discovery; Filed by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order Re: Debtor's Exam; Filed by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff); As to: JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff); As to: JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS (Defendant); Service Date: 12/25/2018; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff); As to: JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff); As to: JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THOMAS BRYANT LEWIS, II (Plaintiff); As to: JAMISON DIQUON HARRIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC15027    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS, SET ONE, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

(CCP § 1054(a))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Thomas Bryant Lewis II’s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Requests for Production of Documents or Things, Set One, and Monetary Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On April 30, 2019, a default judgment was entered in favor of Plaintiff Thomas Bryant Lewis, II (“Judgment Creditor”) and against Defendant Jamison Diquon Harris (“Judgment Debtor”). Plaintiff then filed a Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Requests for Production of Documents and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on July 9, 2019 and an Amended Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Requests for Production of Documents and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Amended Motion”) on July 10.

On its own motion, the Court continued the hearing to December 17, 2019 and ordered the Judgment Creditor to serve the moving papers on Judgment Debtor and file a proof of service in compliance with California Code of Procedure, section 1005. (9/18/19 Minute Order.)

On December 2, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Request to Vacate Hearing on Debtor’s Examination & Motion to Compel Discovery pursuant to the Stipulation regarding Debtor’s Exam filed on November 17, 2019.

II. Conclusion and Order

Based on the foregoing, Judgment Creditor’s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Requests for Production of Documents or Things, Set One, and Monetary Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.