This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 11:16:18 (UTC).

THE SALVATION ARMY VS BLANCA FLORES

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 a Other - Declaratory Judgment case was filed by THE SALVATION ARMY against BLANCA FLORES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0412

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SALVATION ARMY

Defendant

FLORES BLANCA

 

Court Documents

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: FOR AN ORDER TO BE DISCHARGED AND TO DEPOSIT SETTLEMENT FUNDS

1/25/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: FOR AN ORDER TO BE DISCHARGED AND TO DEPOSIT SETTLEMENT FUNDS

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Non-Opposition By Defendants In Interpleader To Plaintiff In Interpleaders Motion For An Order To Be Discharged And To Deposit Settlement Funds

3/7/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Non-Opposition By Defendants In Interpleader To Plaintiff In Interpleaders Motion For An Order To Be Discharged And To Deposit Settlement Funds

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling

3/14/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR AN ORDER TO BE DISCHARGED AND T...)

3/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR AN ORDER TO BE DISCHARGED AND T...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

3/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration

3/22/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/22/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Deposit of Disbursed Funds)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Deposit of Disbursed Funds)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/8/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/7/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/2/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice (name extension) - of acknowledgment

2/13/2018: Notice (name extension) - of acknowledgment

Summons - on Complaint

1/11/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/11/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/11/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 07/11/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Deposit of Disbursed Funds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Deposit of Disbursed Funds) of 06/04/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Deposit of Disbursed Funds scheduled for 06/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 06/04/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Deposit; Filed by: The Salvation Army (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration; Filed by: Blanca Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: The Salvation Army (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: The Salvation Army (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of acknowledgment; Filed by: The Salvation Army (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Salvation Army (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Salvation Army (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC00412    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 94

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Claim of Defendant-in-Interpleader Blanca Flores to interpleader funds is GRANTED AS TO THE FULL AMOUNT OF THE INTERPLEADER FUNDS: $5,197.50. DEFENDANT FLORES TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS.

SUMMARY OF PROCEEDINGS: Complaint in interpleader with respect to settlement reached in underlying personal injury action.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff-in-Interpleader The Salvation Army (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant Complaint in Interpleader against Defendant-in-Interpleaders Blanca Flores (“Defendant Flores”), William W. Green, Ghazi Samir Idriss, Luigi F. Galloni, Department of Health Care Services for the State of California, on January 11, 2018. The Complaint concerns a settlement of $6,000.00 reached in Defendant Flores’ personal injury action against Plaintiff, Flores v. The Salvation Army, LASC Case No. BC597324 (“the personal injury action”).

On March 14, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff’s request to deposit funds and be discharged from the action on condition that it deposit interpleader funds of $5,197.50 and provide notice of the disbursement hearing. The court set the instant hearing regarding disbursement of the funds for October 3, 2019. Plaintiff deposited the funds on March 15, 2019 and gave notice of the order on March 22, 2019.

On March 22, 2019, Defendant Flores filed a declaration in support of a claim to the interpleader funds. At the initial hearing on the disbursement of funds, the Court found that while Defendant Flores’ claim was supported by a declaration avowing she was injured by a trip and fall accident at Plaintiff’s property, it lacked any details regarding the specific amount of damages to which Defendant Flores claims she is entitled or any supporting documentary evidence. The Court continued the hearing to allow Defendant Flores an opportunity to file and serve supplemental evidence in support of her claim to the interpleader funds detailing the damages she has incurred and demonstrating the right to the proceeds of the personal injury settlement. Defendant Flores filed a supplemental declaration on October 3, 2019 supported by documentary evidence showing the medical treatment she received as a result of the slip and fall accident, the cost of which exceeds the amount of the interpleader funds. (Supp. Flores Decl., Exhibits.) Therefore, the Court finds the claim is adequately supported.

Claim of Defendant-in-Interpleader Blanca Flores to interpleader funds is GRANTED AS TO THE FULL AMOUNT OF THE INTERPLEADER FUNDS: $5,197.50. DEFENDANT FLORES TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS.

Court clerk to give notice.