This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 21:08:43 (UTC).

THE PARTS DEPARTMENT, INC. VS JOHN OKONKWO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 THE PARTS DEPARTMENT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN OKONKWO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5858

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PARTS DEPARTMENT INC.

Defendants

OKONKWO JOHN

LAND ROVER ALEXANDRIA

THE GREAT EXPERIMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOESCH PHILIP WENDEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/26/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Consolidation of Cases

1/27/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Consolidation of Cases

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

12/13/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

1/6/2020: Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Motion to Consolidate

1/6/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Motion to Consolidate

Summons - Summons on Complaint (1st)

1/14/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint (1st)

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

8/13/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/20/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by The Parts Department, Inc. on 12/13/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by The Parts Department, Inc. as to The Great Experiment, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAddress for Philip Wendel Boesch (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/12/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Great Experiment, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2020; Service Cost: 6.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Consolidation of Cases; Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Great Experiment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 02/03/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/12/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: John Okonkwo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/19/2019; Service Cost: 206.91; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: John Okonkwo (Defendant); Land Rover Alexandria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: John Okonkwo (Defendant); Land Rover Alexandria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Parts Department, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: John Okonkwo (Defendant); Land Rover Alexandria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05858    Hearing Date: March 12, 2020    Dept: 26

The Parts Department, Inc. v. Okonkwo, et al.

CONSOLIDATION

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a).)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

(CRC, Rule 3.300(a).)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff The Parts Department, Inc.’s Motion to Consolidate is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

On June 20, 2019, Plaintiff The Parts Department, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract, common counts and abuse of process against Defendants John Okonkwo and Land Rover Alexandria (“Defendants”). On August 13, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Related Case with respect to Okonkwo v. The Parts Department, Inc., LASC Case No. 19IWSC00192 (“LASC Case No. 19IWSC00192”) and Okonkwo v. The Parts Department, Inc., LASC Case No. 19IWSC00207 (“LASC Case No. 19IWSC00207”)

LASC Case Nos. 19IWSC00192 and 19IWSC00207 were filed on January 18, 2019 in the Small Claims Department. Following Plaintiff’s request, both cases were transferred to the limited jurisdiction court, Department 94, on July 2, 2019. Both cases were then reassigned to Department 25 in the Spring Street Courthouse on January 21, 2020. Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Consolidate in the current action on January 6, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

Plaintiff failed to comply with requirements for service and filing of the Notice of Related Case. “The Notice of Related Case must be filed in all pending cases listed in the notice and must be served on all parties in those cases.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.300, subd. (e).) The Notice of Related Case, however, was not filed in LASC Case Nos. 19IWSC00192 or 19IWSC00207. While all three cases were assigned for a period of time to the same department, LASC Case Nos. 19IWSC00192 and 19IWSC00207 are currently assigned to a different department (Department 25).

“Where all the cases listed in the notice are unlimited civil cases, or where all the cases listed in the notice are limited civil cases, the judge who has the earliest filed case must determine whether the cases must be ordered related and assigned to his or her department.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.300, subd. (h)(1)(A).) As LASC Case Nos. 19IWSC00192 and 19IWSC00207 were filed prior to this action, the judge in those cases must determine whether the cases are related.

Additionally, “[c]ases may not be consolidated until they are in the same department. A motion

to consolidate two or more cases may be noticed and heard after the cases, initially filed in different

departments, have been related into a single department . . . .” root (LASC Rules, Rule 3.3, subd. (g)(1).) As LASC Case Nos. 19IWSC00192 and 19IWSC00207 are not assigned to this department, the Motion to Consolidate cannot be determined until they have been related to this action and the cases are assigned to the same department.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff The Parts Department, Inc.’s Motion to Consolidate is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.