This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 03:57:34 (UTC).

THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS MELINA ABALKHAD

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against MELINA ABALKHAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9967

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

ABALKHAD MELINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

3/25/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to MELINA ABALKHAD; On the Complaint filed by THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MELINA ABALKHAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MELINA ABALKHAD (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/19/2021; Service Cost: 165.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MELINA ABALKHAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MELINA ABALKHAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE OAKS OF CALABASAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MELINA ABALKHAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M