This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 02:21:58 (UTC).

THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION VS THERESA WATSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THERESA WATSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4505

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HERTZ CORPORATION A CORPORATION

Defendants

WATSON THERESA

WATSON PORSCHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment [PROPOSED] Judgment

8/24/2021: Judgment - Judgment [PROPOSED] Judgment

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...)

Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

1/26/2021: Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

7/7/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

7/21/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BRIAN P. TAPPER IN RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 21, 2021

9/11/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BRIAN P. TAPPER IN RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 21, 2021

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/26/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/27/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketJudgment [PROPOSED] Judgment; Signed and Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THERESA WATSON (Defendant); PORSCHE WATSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation against Defendant THERESA WATSON and Defendant PORSCHE WATSON on the Complaint filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation on 05/27/2020 for damages of $16,778.59 for a total of $16,778.59, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/09/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/09/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/09/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THERESA WATSON (Defendant); PORSCHE WATSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THERESA WATSON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/26/2020; Service Cost: 70.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: PORSCHE WATSON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/26/2020; Service Cost: 80.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THERESA WATSON (Defendant); PORSCHE WATSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THERESA WATSON (Defendant); PORSCHE WATSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THERESA WATSON (Defendant); PORSCHE WATSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC04505 Hearing Date: August 9, 2021 Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION\r\nTO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT THERESA WATSON AND\r\nPORSCHE WATSON

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff\r\nThe Hertz Corporation

\r\n\r\n

RESP. PARTY: None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 664.6)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff The Hertz Corporation’s\r\nMotion to Enforce Settlement and Enter Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is to be\r\nentered against Defendants Theresa Watson and Porsche Watson, jointly and\r\nseverally, in the amount of $16,778.59.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SERVICE: \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nProof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nCorrect Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\n16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

OPPOSITION: None filed as of August\r\n5, 2021 [ ] Late [X]\r\nNone

\r\n\r\n

REPLY: None filed as\r\nof August 5, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

I. \r\nBackground\r\n& Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On May 27, 2020, Plaintiff The Hertz Corporation\r\n(“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Theresa Watson (“Theresa”) and Porsche\r\nWatson (“Porsche”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Defendants did not file an answer.\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On August 26, 2020, Plaintiff filed a notice of\r\nsettlement, indicating the parties had reached a conditional settlement. As a\r\nresult, the trial date was vacated.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Enforce Settlement\r\nAgreement and Enter Judgment Against Defendant Theresa Watson and Porsche Watson\r\n(the “Motion”) on January 26, 2021. No opposition was filed.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

At the initial June 24 hearing, the Court found the\r\nparties’ Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Installment Payments to be valid\r\nand enforceable under Section 664.6. (6/24/21 Minute Order.) Although the Court\r\nwas inclined to grant the Motion, it noted that Defendants had not yet paid\r\ntheir first appearance fee. (Id.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

That same day, each Defendant paid their first appearance\r\nfee.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Accordingly, the Motion is now GRANTED. Judgment is to be\r\nentered against Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $16,778.59.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

II. \r\nConclusion\r\n& Order

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff\r\nThe Hertz Corporation’s Motion to Enforce Settlement and Enter Judgment is\r\nGRANTED. Judgment is to be entered against Defendants Theresa Watson and\r\nPorsche Watson, jointly and severally, in the amount of $16,778.59.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party is ordered to give\r\nnotice.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant