Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:02:24 (UTC).

THE HERITAGE ESCROW COMPANY VS HASHIM, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 10/23/2015 THE HERITAGE ESCROW COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HASHIM, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3090

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HERITAGE ESCROW COMPANY

Defendants

HASHIM MICHAEL

HASHIM TAZIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLOUD, W. DEAN

CLOUD W. DEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/24/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • OSC SET 10/23/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - OTHER REAL PROPERTY Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE - W. DEAN CLOUD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLOUD W. DEAN