This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:54:27 (UTC).

THE HELLON CORPORATION VS JODIE PANEK

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 THE HELLON CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JODIE PANEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL C. SMALL and ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0426

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL C. SMALL

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HELLON CORPORATION DBA THE COMPOUND PRODUCTION HOUSE

Defendant

PANEK JODIE DBA ACTING UP NETWORK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/20/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/20/2016

9/20/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/20/2016

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/20/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/20/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1160614E3893 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160614E3893 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael C. Small at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: The HELLON Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jodie Panek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less