This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2020 at 02:37:25 (UTC).

THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC VS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2077

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC DBA LAKEWOOD HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHN JONATHON E

Defendant Attorney

BARCA DANE C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/24/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/24/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/24/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

5/24/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Vacate Trial Date

7/26/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Vacate Trial Date

Answer - Answer

7/18/2019: Answer - Answer

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

8/22/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/22/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/1/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/30/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 10/05/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC on 05/24/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC on 05/24/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Department of Public Health of The State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Department of Public Health of The State of California (Defendant) to Department of Public Health of The State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAddress for Jonathon E Cohn (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1991360 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 10/05/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint scheduled for 09/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 44 - Hon. Edward B. Moreton; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. Wendy Chang; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Department of Public Health of The State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Department of Public Health of The State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Healthcare Center of Downey, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Department of Public Health of The State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC DBA LAKEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dane Christian Barca