This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 10:17:03 (UTC).

THE CREATION STATION STUDIOS LLC VS KARINA NOELLE CASTILLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 THE CREATION STATION STUDIOS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KARINA NOELLE CASTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0951

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CREATION STATION STUDIOS LLC

Defendants

HERNANDEZ BELL

CASTILLO KARINA NOELLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2020

11/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/16/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/22/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/26/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2020

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/20/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/23/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/5/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by The Creation Station Studios LLC on 03/05/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2020 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/03/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: The Creation Station Studios LLC (Plaintiff); Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant); Bell Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/03/2020 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/12/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: The Creation Station Studios LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Hernandez (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: The Creation Station Studios LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: The Creation Station Studios LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant); Service Cost: 200.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: The Creation Station Studios LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant); Bell Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Bell Hernandez (Defendant), Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant) to Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant), Bell Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant), Bell Hernandez (Defendant) to Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant), Bell Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less