This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 01:57:44 (UTC).

THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS WANTMYLOOK,INC.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WANTMYLOOK,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3102

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

WANTMYLOOK INC. AKA WANT MY LOOK INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEEKS DAVID EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/27/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Kenneth J. Freed Re: Method Of Calculating Interest

11/27/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Kenneth J. Freed Re: Method Of Calculating Interest

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to C.C. Section 1717.5

11/27/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to C.C. Section 1717.5

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/27/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment And Evidence code 1551

11/27/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment And Evidence code 1551

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

11/27/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/16/2019 entered for Plaintiff THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. against Defendant WANTMYLOOK,INC. AKA WANT MY LOOK INC.

1/16/2019: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/16/2019 entered for Plaintiff THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. against Defendant WANTMYLOOK,INC. AKA WANT MY LOOK INC.

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service POS110

10/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service POS110

Summons - (Amended)

8/3/2018: Summons - (Amended)

Summons - on Complaint

7/3/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/3/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/3/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/3/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/16/2019 entered for Plaintiff THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. against Defendant WANTMYLOOK,INC. AKA WANT MY LOOK INC. Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. against Defendant WANTMYLOOK,INC. AKA WANT MY LOOK INC on the Complaint filed by THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. on 07/03/2018 for the principal amount of $4,000.00, attorney fees of $1,000.00, interest of $520.55, and costs of $348.00 for a total of $5,868.55.; Other: Prejudgment interest at the annual rate of 10%: $520.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. on 07/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 through10, inclusive, only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. on 07/03/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC., does 1 through10, inclusive, only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to C.C. Section 1717.5; Filed by: THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Kenneth J. Freed Re: Method Of Calculating Interest; Filed by: THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAmended Summons on Complaint; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: WANTMYLOOK,INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketBusiness & Professions Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WANTMYLOOK INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEEKS DAVID