This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2017 at 09:47:14 (UTC).

THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO VS NEAL WANG

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEAL WANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5680

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO

888 Bicycle Casino Dr.,

Bell Gardens, CA 90201

Defendant

WANG NEAL

Rosemead, CA 91770

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/23/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017

8/23/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/23/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/5/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/5/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the Plaintiff's request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170608E6187 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170608E6187 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff); As to: Neal Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO is a litigant