This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 18:13:14 (UTC).

THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO VS AVRAHAM BIJAMIN

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AVRAHAM BIJAMIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5679

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO

888 Bicycle Casino Dr.,

Bell Gardens, CA 90201

Defendant

BIJAMIN AVRAHAM

Reseda, CA 91335

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/25/2018: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

1/25/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/25/2018: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

11/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

8/23/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/23/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

6/5/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/5/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/25/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff The Bicycle Hotel and Casino against Defendant Avraham Bijamin on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by The Bicycle Hotel and Casino on 06/05/2017 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $3,125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff); As to: Avraham Bijamin (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 01/25/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 11/01/2017 01:30 PM at 11/01/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170608E6197 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170608E6197 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: The Bicycle Hotel and Casino (Plaintiff); As to: Avraham Bijamin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO is a litigant