Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2016 at 10:38:40 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. GATEA, TRINIDAD

Case Summary

On 08/01/2012 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GATEA, TRINIDAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTY M. PETERS and ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0970

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY M. PETERS

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR TH

Defendants

GATEA TRINIDAD

GAETA VICTOR

ESCALANTE JULIO

NAVARRETE ENRIQUE

OSORIO EMMA

VELEZ BELINDA

KLEIN JOHANNA

VILLEGAS TONY

NAVARRO KEITH

FUENTES SAMANTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENTHAL,WITHEM,ZEFF & NAHMI - MICHAEL D ZEFF

ROSENTHAL,WITHEM,ZEFF & NAHMI - MICHAEL D. ZEFF

Attorney at ROSENTHAL,WITHEM,ZEFF & NAHMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/19/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM POM12U00970 TO PAS12UR0970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON) FKA (THE BANK OF NEW YORK) AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWABS, INC., ASSET BACK CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005- AB1 FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL - CASE WAS DISMISSED IN COURT ON 2-27-13. SUBMITTED ON 02/27/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. ANTHONY M. PETERS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCES. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED AND FILED. CLERK SHALL GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2012
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT (FUENTES, SAMANTHA) . . RECEIPT # GC68633 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED ON 08/16/12 BY CLAIMANT(S) (FUENTES, SAMANTHA) . RECEIPT # GC68633 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED ON 08/16/12 BY CLAIMANT(S) (FUENTES, SAMANTHA) . RECEIPT # GC68633 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • LETTER RE: FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM234074009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.