This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2019 at 03:01:09 (UTC).

THANAWADEE ANANKITTIKUL VS RICHARD FISHER

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 THANAWADEE ANANKITTIKUL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHARD FISHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6403

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANANKITTIKUL THANAWADEE DBA WADEE SPA

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendants

FISHER RICHARD DBA RICHARD BUILDING DESIGN CONSULTANT DBA RICHARD CUSTOM BUILDING DESIGNS

FISHER RICHARD DBA RICHARD BUILDING DESIGN CONSULTANT DBA RICHARD CUSTOM BUILDING DESIGNS DBA PLANS & PERMITS BY RICHARD

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Assignee

VAN NUYS FINANCIAL

5632 Van Nuys Boulevard, Suite 300

Van Nuys, CA 91401

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/16/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Writ of Execution

10/25/2017: Writ of Execution

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

12/29/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/10/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

11/30/2017: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/16/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/13/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/8/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

11/10/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/11/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/13/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Order Determining Claim of Exemption

12/29/2017: Order Determining Claim of Exemption

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/25/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

3/8/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Assignment of Judgment

10/25/2017: Assignment of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 12/29/2017

12/29/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 12/29/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 12/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 12/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 12/29/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketOrder Determining Claim Of Exemption; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 12/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: Thanawadee Anankittikul (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Fisher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Van Nuys Financial (Assignee); As to: Richard Fisher (Defendant); Interest: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: Van Nuys Financial (Assignee); As to: Thanawadee Anankittikul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 03/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Thanawadee Anankittikul (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1161116E4980 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161116E4980 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Thanawadee Anankittikul (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Fisher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less