This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 13:34:32 (UTC).

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENTS VS JEANINE FUENTES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEANINE FUENTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5253

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENTS

Defendant

FUENTES JEANINE

Los Angeles, CA 90038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession

1/23/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

1/18/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/4/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/4/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/4/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

1/11/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/22/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

12/19/2017: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

12/20/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/13/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - on Complaint

12/5/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/5/2017: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/6/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Jeanine Fuentes)

12/6/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Jeanine Fuentes)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/5/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Possession); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: TGA Management & Investments (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 61.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/04/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff TGA Management & Investments against Defendant Jeanine Fuentes on the Complaint filed by TGA Management & Investments on 12/05/2017 for past rent due in the amount of $4,785.00 and holdover damages $4,008.55 for a total of $8,793.55. Cost to be determined per filing of Memorandum of Costs.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 5831 Virgina Ave Apt #6, Los Angeles, CA 90038 is granted for plaintiff(s);; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: TGA Management & Investments (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanine Fuentes (Defendant); Service Date: 12/10/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by: Jeanine Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jeanine Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: TGA Management & Investments (Plaintiff); As to: Jeanine Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TGA Management & Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Deborah L. Christian in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F