This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2019 at 10:45:00 (UTC).

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT VS. NUNEZ, MIRIAM

Case Summary

On 03/13/2014 TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NUNEZ, MIRIAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2666

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NANCY NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT

Defendant

NUNEZ MIRIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF E. HOUSTON TOUCEDA - E. HOUSTON TOUCEDA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF E. HOUSTON TOUCEDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/25/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SM441803012 . MAILED SASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED AS TO (TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 23.34 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (NUNEZ, MIRIAM) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 03/25/14 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/26/14 , FOR (TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT) , AGAINST (NUNEZ, MIRIAM) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 6820 LAUREL CANYON BLVD #11 LOS ANGELES, CA 91605 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR TRIAL: AN ANSWER HAS NOT BEEN FILED SUBMITTED ON 03/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (NUNEZ, MIRIAM) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM, NOTICE OF OSC, GENERAL ORDER FILED. SERVED AS TO (NUNEZ, MIRIAM) . COSTS OF $ 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (NUNEZ, MIRIAM) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 03/25/14 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM519607022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 09/08/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE NANCY NEWMAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF E. HOUSTON TOUCEDA - E. HOUSTON TOUCEDA