Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 14:41:00 (UTC).

TERRY HOISEONG KIM VS LATASHA LANIER TURNER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 TERRY HOISEONG KIM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LATASHA LANIER TURNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5113

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM TERRY HOISEONG

Defendants

HOLLYWOOD RIDES INC

TURNER LATASHA LANIER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

4/14/2021: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment (By Fax)

4/14/2021: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment (By Fax)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/16/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

2/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/12/2020

11/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/12/2020

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/1/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/21/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

8/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • Hearing06/18/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 90 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment (By Fax); Filed by: Latasha Lanier Turner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Terry Hoiseong Kim against Defendant Latasha Lanier Turner and Defendant Hollywood Rides Inc on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Terry Hoiseong Kim on 07/21/2020 for the principal amount of $7,157.00 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $7,312.00, joint and several.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 03/16/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Terry Hoiseong Kim (Plaintiff); Latasha Lanier Turner (Defendant); Hollywood Rides Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 03:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/16/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Terry Hoiseong Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Hollywood Rides Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/13/2020; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Terry Hoiseong Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Latasha Lanier Turner (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/19/2020; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 03:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Terry Hoiseong Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Terry Hoiseong Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Latasha Lanier Turner (Defendant); Hollywood Rides Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD RIDES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant