This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2019 at 04:26:57 (UTC).

TERRELL BRANCH VS JAMES BURGER

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 TERRELL BRANCH filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JAMES BURGER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANCH TERRELL

Defendant

BURGER JAMES

Los Angeles, CA 90016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIERSTADT EDWARD TERRY

Defendant Attorney

WENGER KAIMIPONO DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

1/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/15/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JAMES BURGER)

1/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JAMES BURGER)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/17/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Answer - Answer

1/25/2019: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/25/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES

1/28/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Order to Show Cause (Hearing) - Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

2/15/2019: Order to Show Cause (Hearing) - Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

2/28/2019: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

3/1/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

3/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Re: Settlement Conference

3/19/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Re: Settlement Conference

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 04/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Pursuant to oral stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/04/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Stipulation and Order Re: Settlement Conference; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 66 updated: Result Date to 03/19/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TERRELL BRANCH (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: TERRELL BRANCH (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES BURGER (Defendant); Service Date: 01/22/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TERRELL BRANCH (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/22/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: JAMES BURGER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Answer; Filed by: JAMES BURGER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas LONG in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: TERRELL BRANCH (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES BURGER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TERRELL BRANCH (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES BURGER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TERRELL BRANCH (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES BURGER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIERSTADT EDWARD TERRY