Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 13:15:59 (UTC).

TERESA VILLASENOR VS LACMTA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 TERESA VILLASENOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LACMTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4812

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLASENOR TERESA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

KUMAR TAMAL

KUMAR RASABIHARI

LACMTA

HALL ALANECIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LACMTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RAYMOND

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MCCLENDON NYKEEMAH

WEND CHRISTOPHER P

 

Court Documents

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/4/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

10/10/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/31/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - Summons on Complaint (1st)

11/14/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint (1st)

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

11/14/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/10/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

1/17/2020: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

1/17/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/29/2020: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Contesting the Good Faith of Settlement

2/10/2020: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Contesting the Good Faith of Settlement

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/19/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

2/20/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/19/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition CROSS-DEFENDANT RASABEHARI KUMAR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METROS MOTION CONTESTESTING THE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT RASABEHAR

3/20/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition CROSS-DEFENDANT RASABEHARI KUMAR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METROS MOTION CONTESTESTING THE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT RASABEHAR

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/28/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/20/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Hearing06/28/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/28/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 11/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority dba Metro Erroneously Sued As LACMTA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketAddress for Christopher P Wend (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Teresa Villasenor (Plaintiff); As to: LACMTA (Defendant); Alanecia Hall (Defendant); Tamal Kumar (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teresa Villasenor (Plaintiff); As to: LACMTA (Defendant); Alanecia Hall (Defendant); Tamal Kumar (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Teresa Villasenor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Teresa Villasenor (Plaintiff); As to: LACMTA (Defendant); Alanecia Hall (Defendant); Tamal Kumar (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04812    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 94

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10 et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority’s Demurrer to the Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

The hearing on Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority’s Demurrer to the Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT. Plaintiff Teresa Villasenor timely filed a First Amended Complaint on October 10, 2019. The First Amended Complaint is now the operative pleading.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LACMTA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLENDON NYKEEMAH