Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:38:12 (UTC).

TERESA SCOTT SANCHEZ, ET AL. VS STEPHEN PETER SCHIMKOS

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 TERESA SCOTT SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHEN PETER SCHIMKOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5418

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ TERRANCE SCOTT

Defendants

AUTONATION INC.

MERCEDES BENZ OF SOUTH BAY

SCHIMKOS STEPHEN PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

3/27/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/22/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Complaint

11/17/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/17/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/17/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/17/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service /Dismissal scheduled for 10/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff); Jess Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Stephen Peter Schimkos (Defendant); Service Date: 05/07/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketJess Scott Sanchez, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Terrance Scott Sanchez; Filed by: Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Jess Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff): First Name changed from Teresa to Terrance

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Teresa Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff); Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Stephen Peter Schimkos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Teresa Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Teresa Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teresa Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff); Terrance Scott Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC05418    Hearing Date: September 14, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290, 2031.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

DEFENDANT STEPHEN PETER SCHIMKUS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS’ VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IS DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ OF SOUTH BAY is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTONATION INC DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant