This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2019 at 06:03:37 (UTC).

TERESA R. GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS MARIA G. OROZCO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 TERESA R GONZALEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIA G OROZCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5115

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUZMAN MARCO A.

GONZALEZ TERESA R.

Defendants

MARTINEZ RUBEN G.

OROZCO MARIA G.

Not Classified By Court and Assignees

FROST ESCROW CO.

LANPHERE MICHAEL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

LANPHERE MICHAEL A.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ASSIGN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/30/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/28/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/28/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/28/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/28/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Certificate of Mailing for - [Financial Statement, Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

1/5/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Financial Statement, Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

1/5/2017: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

1/13/2017: Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

1/19/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

1/18/2017: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection

2/3/2017: Notice of Rejection

Assignment of Judgment

2/7/2017: Assignment of Judgment

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: TERESA R. GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MARCO A. GUZMAN (Plaintiff); FROST ESCROW CO., (Assignee); As to: TERESA R. GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MARCO A. GUZMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: MARIA G. OROZCO (Defendant); RUBEN G. MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketResponse to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: TERESA R. GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketRequest to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: MARIA G. OROZCO (Defendant); RUBEN G. MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketFinancial Statement; Filed by: MARIA G. OROZCO (Defendant); RUBEN G. MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Financial Statement, Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 12/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/28/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/28/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff TERESA R. GONZALEZ; Plaintiff MARCO A. GUZMAN against Defendant MARIA G. OROZCO; Defendant RUBEN G. MARTINEZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by TERESA R. GONZALEZ, et al. on 10/06/2016 for the principal amount of $4,200.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $4,250.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: TERESA R. GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA G. OROZCO (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TERESA R. GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: RUBEN G. MARTINEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2016; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2016-0005578 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: TERESA R. GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MARCO A. GUZMAN (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA G. OROZCO (Defendant); RUBEN G. MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANPHERE MICHAEL A.