This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 07:44:28 (UTC).

TEDDY ANIM-BEDWA VS ALEXANDRA APARTMENTS

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 TEDDY ANIM-BEDWA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ALEXANDRA APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1259

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANIM-BEDWA TEDDY

Defendants

ALEXANDRA APARTMENTS

ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP E/S/A ALEXANDRIA APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COHEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

6/8/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

6/8/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/08/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer

8/12/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

8/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

5/22/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/23/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/28/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/18/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/10/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/10/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/10/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Teddy Anim-Bedwa on 12/10/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP e/s/a Alexandria Apartments (Defendant); As to: Teddy Anim-Bedwa (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 840.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 06/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/19/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP e/s/a Alexandria Apartments (Defendant); As to: Teddy Anim-Bedwa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Teddy Anim-Bedwa (Plaintiff); As to: Alexandra Apartments (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Teddy Anim-Bedwa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Teddy Anim-Bedwa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teddy Anim-Bedwa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11259    Hearing Date: August 19, 2020    Dept: 26

DEMURRER

(CCP §§ 430.31, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Alexandria Housing Partners, L’s Demurrer to the Complaint is SUSTAINED WITH 20 DAYS’ LEAVE TO AMEND.

ANALYSIS:

On December 10, 2019, Plaintiff Teddy Anim-Bedwa (“Plaintiff”), in pro per, filed the instant action against Defendant Alexandria Housing Partners, LP (erroneously sued as Alexandra Apartments) (“Defendant”). On April 23, 2020, Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to the Complaint. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

The Court finds that the Demurrer is accompanied by a meet and confer declaration as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41. (Cohen Decl., filed 3/18/20, ¶¶1-2.) In demurring to the Complaint, Defendant contends that the Complaint fails to allege sufficient facts to state a cause of action. (Citing Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (e).)

The Complaint purports to allege causes of action for (1) breach of contract; and (2) common counts. (Compl., ¶¶BC and CC.) However, no facts are alleged in support of either cause of action.

The elements of a breach of contract claim are (1) existence of contract; (2) plaintiff’s performance or excuse for nonperformance; (3) defendant’s breach (or anticipatory breach); and (4) resulting damage to plaintiff. (Hale v. Sharp Healthcare (2010) 183 Cal.App.4th 1373, 1387.) Additionally, the substantive terms of the agreement must be set forth. (Construction Protective Services, Inc. v. TIG Specialty Ins. Co. (2002) 29 Cal.4th 189, 198-199.)

The Complaint does not allege any facts about the parties’ contract, including the nature of the agreement, when it was executed, when it was to be performed, or the consideration to be exchanged. (Compl., ¶BC.) Instead, the Complaint refers to an attachment for the relevant facts, but no attachment is submitted with the Complaint. (Ibid.)

For the cause of action for common counts, Plaintiff must allege facts regarding (1) the statement of indebtedness in a certain sum, (2) the consideration, i.e., goods sold, work done, etc., and (3) nonpayment. (Farmers Ins. Exchange v. Zerin (1997) 53 Cal.App.4th 445, 460.) The Complaint, however, does not allege any facts regarding the indebtedness, the consideration that was exchanged, or Defendant’s failure to pay. (Compl., ¶CC.)

Based on the foregoing, the Court finds the Complaint fails to state facts sufficient to state a cause of action. Defendant Alexandria Housing Partners, LP’s unopposed Demurrer to the Complaint is SUSTAINED WITH 20 DAYS’ LEAVE TO AMEND.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alexandria Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS L.P. is a litigant